Wedo-Edu

# 6 Vedic Maths Tricks: Calculate 10x Faster

## Vedic Maths Tricks for Fast Calculation

Before I provide 8 Vedic math strategies for quick calculations, let me give you a quick overview of Vedic maths so you don’t have to look up terminology on the internet. These Vedic Math methods are also effective in reducing calculation time in competitive exams such as JEE, CBSE/ICE Board, and other competitive exams.

## What Is Meant By Vedic Mathematics?

‘Vedic’ is derived from the Sanskrit word ‘Veda,’ which meaning ‘Knowledge.’ Vedic Math is a fantastic collection of sutras for solving math problems quickly and easily.

## Who Is The Father Of Vedic Maths?

Vedic mathematics simplifies mathematical operations, and its formulae and concepts are becoming more widely accepted. Shankaracharya Bharti Krishna Tirthaji, known as the ‘Father of Vedic Mathematics,’ discovered Vedic Math, an ancient way of addressing mathematical difficulties.

You will learn 8 Vedic Maths methods in this article that you may use to tackle your ICSE/ CBSE Math or JEE problems in less time and with greater accuracy. You won’t need calculators for any large computations once you’ve mastered these Vedic Math methods. These Vedic Math Tricks are really beneficial in passing any competitive exam. So here are the eight Vedic Math methods I mentioned earlier:

1. Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5

You can rapidly get the square of a two-digit integer ending in 5 using this Vedic Math method.
Whatever syllabus you follow, whether CBSE or ICSE, you will undoubtedly encounter such sums.

For example Find (55) ² =?

Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)
Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30

So our answer will be 3025.

Well, if you have understood the process try to find the square of 75 & 95.

2. Multiply a Number By 5

In general, you’ll come across similar calculations in ICSE/ CBSE exams or assignments, or while mentally solving a Math issue (JEE, KVPY, Olympiad, and so on). Use this trick the next time to save time.

Take any number, and depending on its even or odd nature, divide the number by 2 (get half of the number).

Even Number:

2464 x 5 =?
Step 1. 2464 / 2 = 1232
The answer will be 2464 x 5 = 12320Odd Number:
3775 x 5
Step 1. Odd number; so ( 3775 – 1) / 2 = 1887
Step 2. As it is an odd number, so instead of 0 we will put 5
The answer will be 3775 x 5 = 18875Time to check your knowledge:

Now try —- 1234 x 5, 123 x 5
3. Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000
Tell me how long it will take you to remove a number from a multiple of 100, such as 1000, 1000, or 10000. Is there a time limit of one minute or less? Leave that aside and see if you can calculate with this new formula and see whether it’s simple and shortens your calculating time!
For example:
1000 – 573 =? (Subtraction from 1000)
We simply subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10.
Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4
Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2
Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7

So, the answer is: (1000 – 573) = 427

Here are some practice sums for you. Try to solve these sums using the mentioned Vedic Math Tricks.

1000 – 857, 10,000 – 1029, 10,000 – 1264, 1000 – 336.

4. Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11 – 19)
Until Math is introduced, you must perform similar calculations on a daily basis, whether you are a CBSE or ICSE student. This Vedic Trick is notably useful for calculating the outcome of any two-digit integer between 11 and 19.

After you’ve used this Vedic Trick a few times, you may never need a calculator again since you’ll be able to calculate faster than the machine.

There are 4 steps to get the result:

Step 1. Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.
Step 2. Next, multiply the result by 10.
Step 3. Now, multiply the unit digits of both the 2-digit numbers.
Step 4. Then add both the numbers.For example: Let’s take two numbers 13 & 15.
Step 1. 15 + 3 =18.
Step 2. 18*10 = 180.
Step 3. 3*5 = 15
Step 4. Add the two numbers, 180+15 and the answer is 195.5. Dividing A Large Number By 5Tell me how you normally divide a huge number by five. And how long does it take you to solve such problems? Here is the task at hand:

multiply 2128 by 5. Start the timer before you begin.

In 2 seconds, you’ve completed your task? Ok! Is it really only 4 seconds? No? So, the next time you divide a number, use this Vedic Trick and keep track of how long it takes you to solve the total.

So, what are the steps?

1st step. Multiply the number by 2
2nd step: Move the decimal point to left.

For example: 245 / 5 =?
Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490
Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0 or just 49

Let’s try another: 2129 / 5
Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258
Step2: Move the decimal: 425.8 or just 425

Now you try to solve 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5

6. Multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11

This Vedic Math technique will allow you to accomplish multiplication in under 2 seconds. So, let’s see how you may use this Vedic Trick to shorten your computation time.

For example:

32 x 11

32 * 11 = 3 (3+2) 2 = 352
So, the answer is: 32 * 11 =352

Another Example:

52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572

Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.